MN SF2437 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care assistance obsolete language removal
Title
Child care assistance obsolete language removal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: No recommendation |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2476 (Similar To) 2023-03-16 - Second reading