MN SF2436 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-01 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-01 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income, franchise, and property tax refund provisions federal law conformance and administrative mechanism for future federal changes; account creation; money transfer
Title
Income, franchise, and property tax refund provisions federal law conformance and administrative mechanism for future federal changes; account creation; money transfer
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Rod Skoe [D] | Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] |
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Author added Franzen |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2875 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Author added Fischer.