MN SF241 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - (Non-revisor companion) HF14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Help America Vote Act account appropriation for certain authorized purposes; statewide voter registration system reports use requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Help America Vote Act account appropriation for certain authorized purposes; statewide voter registration system reports use requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27Senate(Non-revisor companion) HF14
2019-02-27SenateHF substituted on General Orders HF14
2019-02-21SenateSecond reading
2019-02-21SenateRule 12.10: report of votes in committee
2019-02-21SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-02-11SenateAuthor stricken Howe
2019-02-11SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2019-02-04SenateChief author added Kiffmeyer
2019-02-04SenateChief author stricken, shown as co-author Howe
2019-01-17SenateReferred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2019-01-17SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF17 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Motion did not prevail

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback