MN SF2360 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2128
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus health and human services policy and finance bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus health and human services policy and finance bill

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateRule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2128
2021-04-26SenateSecond reading
2021-04-26SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2021-04-12SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2021-04-07SenateAuthors added Abeler; Draheim
2021-04-06SenateReferred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2021-04-06SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2128 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 30

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback