MN SF2356 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Author added Pratt
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Author added Pratt
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unilateral Emergency Powers Repeal Act
Title
Unilateral Emergency Powers Repeal Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Author added Pratt |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Author added Lang |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2204 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Authors added Poston, Miller and Drazkowski