MN SF2329 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Comm report: Amend previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Wild Rice Stewardship Council establishment and appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wild Rice Stewardship Council establishment and appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateComm report: Amend previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended and re-refer to Finance
2019-03-26SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2019-03-26SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration
2019-03-13SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2019-03-11SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
2019-03-11SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2378 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback