MN SF2314 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House conferees Hansen; Persell; Fischer; Becker-Finn; Nelson, N.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus environment and natural resources bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus environment and natural resources bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: Passage (Y: 73 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 66 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Passage (Y: 73 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 66 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 59 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseHouse conferees Hansen; Persell; Fischer; Becker-Finn; Nelson, N.
2019-05-01HouseHouse accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed
2019-05-01HouseSenate conferees Ingebrigtsen, Ruud, Eichorn, Johnson, Tomassoni
2019-05-01HouseSenate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2019-05-01SenateHouse conferees Hansen; Persell; Fischer; Becker-Finn; Nelson, N.
2019-05-01SenateSenate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Ruud; Eichorn; Johnson; Tomassoni
2019-04-30SenateSenate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
2019-04-30SenateReturned from House with amendment
2019-04-30HouseBill was passed as amended
2019-04-30HouseThird reading as amended
2019-04-30HouseAmended
2019-04-26HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 30, 2019
2019-04-25HouseSecond reading
2019-04-25HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2019-04-24HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2209
2019-04-24HouseReceived from Senate
2019-04-23SenateThird reading Passed
2019-04-23SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2019-04-11SenateSecond reading
2019-04-11SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-04-10SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2019-03-11SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
2019-03-11SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2209 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF2314&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF2314&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF2314&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF2314&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF2314&version=3&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=3165
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF2314&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10362
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF2314&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10363
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF2314&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10364
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF2314&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10365
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF2314&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10362
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF2314&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10363
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF2314&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10364
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF2314&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10365

Bill Comments

feedback