MN SF2307 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Senate file first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Senate file first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Trichloroethylene (TCE) emissions response account and stakeholder group creation; TCE emissions fines disposition
Title
Trichloroethylene (TCE) emissions response account and stakeholder group creation; TCE emissions fines disposition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
2019-05-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2368 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy