MN SF2282 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Chief author added Nelson
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Chief author added Nelson
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prekindergarten-grade 12 evidence-based grant standard establishment
Title
Prekindergarten-grade 12 evidence-based grant standard establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Chief author added Nelson |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Rosen |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF125 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 17, 2020