MN SF2267 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2097
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2097
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hennepin county library director qualifications modification
Title
Hennepin county library director qualifications modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2097 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Chief author added Anderson, P. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Hall |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2097 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 48