MN SF2233 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Author added Duckworth
Pending: Senate Housing and Homelessness Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Author added Duckworth
Pending: Senate Housing and Homelessness Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stable housing mediation grant program establishment
Title
Stable housing mediation grant program establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Zaynab Mohamed [D] | Sen. Lindsey Port [D] | Sen. Bonnie Westlin [D] | Sen. Liz Boldon [D] |
Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Author added Boldon |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Author added Westlin |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Homelessness Prevention |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1215 (Similar To) 2023-04-03 - Author added Hussein