MN SF2229 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Authors added Kupec; Mann
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Authors added Kupec; Mann
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care assistance eligibility and co-payment requirements
Title
Child care assistance eligibility and co-payment requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] | Sen. Liz Boldon [D] | Sen. Nicole Mitchell [D] | Sen. Rob Kupec [D] |
Sen. Alice Mann [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | Authors added Kupec; Mann |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Author added Mitchell |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2471 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Author added Feist