MN SF2220 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Chief author added Eichorn
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Chief author added Eichorn
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School trust lands director provisions modifications
Title
School trust lands director provisions modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Chief author added Eichorn |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Newton |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2383 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Second reading