MN SF2201 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - HF substituted in committee HF2032
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Environmental and natural resources trust fund appropriations; previous appropriations modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental and natural resources trust fund appropriations; previous appropriations modifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateHF substituted in committee HF2032
2019-05-14SenateChief author added Chamberlain
2019-05-14SenateChief author stricken Westrom
2019-03-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
2019-03-07SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2032 (Similar To) 2019-05-18 - Third reading Passed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback