MN SF218 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Author added Torres Ray
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ranked choice voting implementation in federal and state elective offices establishment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ranked choice voting implementation in federal and state elective offices establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11SenateAuthor added Torres Ray
2021-02-04SenateAuthor added Carlson
2021-02-01SenateAuthor added Franzen
2021-01-28SenateAuthor added Cwodzinski
2021-01-21SenateReferred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2021-01-21SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF89 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Referred by Chair to Local Government Division

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback