MN SF2162 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Author added Cohen
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Interstate state park name change to Walter F. Mondale state park

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate state park name change to Walter F. Mondale state park

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateAuthor added Cohen
2019-03-11SenateAuthor stricken Koran
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
2019-03-07SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1963 (Similar To) 2019-03-15 - Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback