MN SF2162 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Author added Cohen
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Author added Cohen
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interstate state park name change to Walter F. Mondale state park
Title
Interstate state park name change to Walter F. Mondale state park
Sponsors
Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Karla Bigham [D] | Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] |
Sen. Richard Cohen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Author added Cohen |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Author stricken Koran |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1963 (Similar To) 2019-03-15 - Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division