MN SF2159 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Application of environmental review statues clarification to regional and local comprehensive land use planning

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Application of environmental review statues clarification to regional and local comprehensive land use planning

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy
2023-03-09SenateAuthor added Duckworth
2023-02-27SenateReferred to State and Local Government and Veterans
2023-02-27SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2004 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Author added Her

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback