MN SF2151 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Bigham
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mighty Ducks grants appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mighty Ducks grants appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateAuthor added Bigham
2019-03-14SenateAuthor added Dziedzic
2019-03-11SenateAuthor added Draheim
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Capital Investment
2019-03-07SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1812 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Author added Backer

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback