MN SF2138 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Author added Utke
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Author added Utke
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution expressing concern over persistent and credible reports of systematic, state-sanctioned, forced organ harvesting from nonconsenting prisoners of conscience, primarily from Falun Gong practitioners imprisoned for their spiritual beliefs, and members of other religious and ethnic minority groups in the People's Republic of China
Title
Resolution expressing concern over persistent and credible reports of systematic, state-sanctioned, forced organ harvesting from nonconsenting prisoners of conscience, primarily from Falun Gong practitioners imprisoned for their spiritual beliefs, and members of other religious and ethnic minority groups in the People's Republic of China
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
Sen. Paul Utke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Author added Utke |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Author added Pratt |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Author added Westrom |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |