MN SF2094 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Author added Ruud
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Author added Ruud
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Telecommuter Forward! certification establishment
Title
Telecommuter Forward! certification establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Author added Ruud |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2181 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2181 (Similar To) 2019-05-06 - Secretary of State Chapter 13 05/03/2019