MN SF2091 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Authors added Newton; Housley
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Authors added Newton; Housley
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individual income tax unlimited social security income subtraction authorization
Title
Individual income tax unlimited social security income subtraction authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Dornink [R] | Sen. Jeremy Miller [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] |
Sen. Karin Housley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authors added Newton; Housley |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Author added Rarick |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2275 (Similar To) 2021-04-09 - Author added Boe