MN SF2081 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Kunesh
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Kunesh
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Racial equity impact notes issuance for legislation process establishment; advisory group duties; appropriation
Title
Racial equity impact notes issuance for legislation process establishment; advisory group duties; appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Bobby Champion [D] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] |
Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Author added Kunesh |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Author added Hawj |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2297 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Author added Xiong, T.