MN SF2067 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable development account, energy storage systems, solar energy systems grant program, reserve accounts, electric vehicle charging station loan program, net zero emissions project, biomass energy plant closure compensation, green roofs task force, energy storage systems cost-benefit analysis; appropriations
Title
Renewable development account, energy storage systems, solar energy systems grant program, reserve accounts, electric vehicle charging station loan program, net zero emissions project, biomass energy plant closure compensation, green roofs task force, energy storage systems cost-benefit analysis; appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. David Osmek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1833 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means