MN SF2043 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Author added Franzen
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Author added Franzen
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Girl Scouts River Valleys ConnectZ program appropriation
Title
Girl Scouts River Valleys ConnectZ program appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Sen. Patricia Torres Ray [D] | Sen. Charles Wiger [D] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Author added Franzen |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Authors added Torres Ray; Wiger; Nelson |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1092 (Similar To) 2021-04-09 - Author added Richardson