MN SF2027 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
E-cigarettes regulations
Title
E-cigarettes regulations
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Sheran [D] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Chris Eaton [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] |
Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Comm report: Amend previous comm report Re-referred to Finance |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Commerce |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |