MN SF2026 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Re-referred to State and Local Government and Veterans
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Speed safety camera enforcement pilot program establishment and appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Speed safety camera enforcement pilot program establishment and appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30SenateRe-referred to State and Local Government and Veterans
2024-04-30SenateComm report: Amend previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended
2024-04-15SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2024-04-15SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation
2024-03-11SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-02-21SenateReferred to Transportation
2023-02-21SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2098 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback