MN SF201 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF330
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF330
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Statutory or home rule charter city two-thirds vote for interim ordinance imposition; interim housing ordinance imposition 10-day notice and public hearing requirements
Title
Statutory or home rule charter city two-thirds vote for interim ordinance imposition; interim housing ordinance imposition 10-day notice and public hearing requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hall [R] | Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] | Sen. David Osmek [R] | Sen. Matt Little [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF330 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Author stricken Jensen |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF330 (Similar To) 2017-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 49