MN SF2 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Family child care providers provisions modifications; office of ombudsperson for child care providers creation; family child care working group establishment; appropriations; reporting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family child care providers provisions modifications; office of ombudsperson for child care providers creation; family child care working group establishment; appropriations; reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2019-03-20SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy
2019-03-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
2019-01-14SenateAuthors added Benson; Kiffmeyer; Nelson; Weber
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Family Care and Aging
2019-01-10SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1701 (Similar To) 2019-03-01 - Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback