MN SF1984 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Air ventilation program establishment for public school buildings
Title
Air ventilation program establishment for public school buildings
Sponsors
Sen. Nick Frentz [D] | Sen. Liz Boldon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Author added Boldon |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Education Policy |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2100 (Similar To) 2023-03-13 - Author added Kraft