MN SF1965 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Student support personnel aid establishment and appropriation
Title
Student support personnel aid establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Sen. Susan Kent [D] | Sen. Aric Putnam [D] | Sen. Jason Isaacson [D] |
Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Author added Isaacson |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Authors added Kent; Putnam |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1742 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Author added Hollins