MN SF1902 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Newton
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Newton
Pending: Senate Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community eligibility provision requirement for school meal program participation establishment; compensatory revenue modification
Title
Community eligibility provision requirement for school meal program participation establishment; compensatory revenue modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Authors added Kunesh; Tomassoni |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1985 (Similar To) 2022-03-23 - Author added Pryor