MN SF1895 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Authors added Relph; Anderson, B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Authors added Relph; Anderson, B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stays of adjudication and imposition in criminal sexual conduct cases elimination; sex offenders lifetime conditional release or probation requirement; sex offenders intensive probation establishment; child pornography offenses increased penalties
Title
Stays of adjudication and imposition in criminal sexual conduct cases elimination; sex offenders lifetime conditional release or probation requirement; sex offenders intensive probation establishment; child pornography offenses increased penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Authors added Relph; Anderson, B. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Author added Ingebrigtsen |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1572 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Authors added Whelan and Pugh.