MN SF1875 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Zero-based budgeting establishment
Title
Zero-based budgeting establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Authors added Chamberlain; Koran |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2312 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Authors added Demuth, Theis, Scott, and Lucero