MN SF1871 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders, pursuant to rule 5.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders, pursuant to rule 5.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conversion therapy with children or vulnerable adults, medical assistance coverage, and conversion therapy services or products misrepresentation prohibitions
Title
Conversion therapy with children or vulnerable adults, medical assistance coverage, and conversion therapy services or products misrepresentation prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders, pursuant to rule 5.1 (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders, pursuant to rule 5.1 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Author added Port |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2156 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Author added Masin