MN SF186 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Author added Pappas
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Author added Pappas
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Air quality permit cumulative pollution analysis and consideration requirement modification prior to issuance
Title
Air quality permit cumulative pollution analysis and consideration requirement modification prior to issuance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF168 (Similar To) 2021-04-12 - Author added Moller