MN SF1839 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Author added Duckworth
Pending: Senate Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Author added Duckworth
Pending: Senate Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing supports for persons with a mental illness appropriation
Title
Housing supports for persons with a mental illness appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1860 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Author added Hollins