MN SF1824 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1510, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public safety provisions modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public safety provisions modifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-25SenateRule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1510, SF indefinitely postponed
2023-03-30SenateSecond reading
2023-03-30SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2023-03-22SenateWithdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-03-02SenateGeneral Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
2023-03-01SenateSecond reading
2023-03-01SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2023-02-16SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-02-16SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1510 (Similar To) 2023-04-25 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback