MN SF182 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Biomass business compensation authorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Biomass business compensation authorization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
2019-03-14SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2019-03-04SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy
2019-01-17SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1677 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Author added Anderson

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback