MN SF18 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Author added Newton
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment authorizing the entering into the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment authorizing the entering into the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-25SenateAuthor added Newton
2021-01-14SenateAuthors added Port; Dziedzic
2021-01-14SenateAuthor stricken Wiger
2021-01-11SenateAuthors added Wiger; Hawj
2021-01-07SenateReferred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2021-01-07SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF192 (Similar To) 2021-01-25 - Author added Bernardy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback