MN SF1798 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Chief author added Hall
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Chief author added Hall
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lead safe home grant program creation and appropriation
Title
Lead safe home grant program creation and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hall [R] | Sen. Matt Little [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] |
Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Chief author added Hall |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Little |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1007 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Author added Pinto