MN SF1786 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Author added Putnam
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Author added Putnam
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Age-Friendly Minnesota Council establishment
Title
Age-Friendly Minnesota Council establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Author added Putnam |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Author added Franzen |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Author added Ingebrigtsen |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Aging and Long-Term Care Policy |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1807 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Author added Wazlawik