MN SF1762 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Family Child Care Task Force recommendations implementation
Title
Family Child Care Task Force recommendations implementation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Licensing Policy |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2003 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Author added Wazlawik as chief author