MN SF1743 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Secretary of State Chapter 5 04/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Secretary of State Chapter 5 04/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Snow day relief bill; calculation of days and hours of instruction for students affected by snow days during the 2018-2019 school year modification
Title
Snow day relief bill; calculation of days and hours of instruction for students affected by snow days during the 2018-2019 school year modification
Sponsors
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Jerry Relph [R] |
Sen. Karin Housley [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: S.F. NO. 1743 (Y: 115 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 105 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: S.F. NO. 1743 (Y: 115 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 105 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Secretary of State Chapter 5 04/01/2019 | |
2019-04-03 | Governor's action Approval 04/01/2019 | |
2019-04-01 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-04-01 | Governor approval | |
2019-04-01 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-04-01 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2019-03-28 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2019-03-28 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2019-03-28 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2019-03-28 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2019-03-28 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2019-03-25 | Senate | House conferees Christensen; Youakim; Urdahl |
2019-03-21 | House | House conferees Christensen, Youakim, Urdahl |
2019-03-21 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2019-03-21 | House | Senate conferees Nelson, Wiger, Jasinski |
2019-03-21 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate conferees Nelson; Wiger; Jasinski |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2019-03-18 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2019-03-18 | House | Third reading as amended |
2019-03-18 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2019-03-18 | House | Amended |
2019-03-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 18, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-03-11 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1982 |
2019-03-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Authors added Rest; Relph; Housley |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1982 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Author added Bernardy