MN SF1743 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Secretary of State Chapter 5 04/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Snow day relief bill; calculation of days and hours of instruction for students affected by snow days during the 2018-2019 school year modification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Snow day relief bill; calculation of days and hours of instruction for students affected by snow days during the 2018-2019 school year modification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 115 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 105 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Secretary of State Chapter 5 04/01/2019
2019-04-03 Governor's action Approval 04/01/2019
2019-04-01 Secretary of State, Filed
2019-04-01 Governor approval
2019-04-01 Presented to Governor
2019-04-01SenateHouse adopted SCC report and repassed bill
2019-03-28HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference
2019-03-28HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2019-03-28HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2019-03-28HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2019-03-28HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
2019-03-28SenateThird reading
2019-03-28SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2019-03-28SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2019-03-25SenateHouse conferees Christensen; Youakim; Urdahl
2019-03-21HouseHouse conferees Christensen, Youakim, Urdahl
2019-03-21HouseHouse accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed
2019-03-21HouseSenate conferees Nelson, Wiger, Jasinski
2019-03-21HouseSenate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2019-03-21SenateSenate conferees Nelson; Wiger; Jasinski
2019-03-20SenateSenate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2019-03-20SenateReturned from House with amendment
2019-03-18HouseBill was passed as amended
2019-03-18HouseThird reading as amended
2019-03-18HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken
2019-03-18HouseAmended
2019-03-14HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 18, 2019
2019-03-13HouseSecond reading
2019-03-13HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2019-03-11HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1982
2019-03-11HouseReceived from Senate
2019-03-07SenateThird reading Passed
2019-03-07SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2019-03-04SenateSecond reading
2019-03-04SenateComm report: To pass
2019-02-27SenateAuthors added Rest; Relph; Housley
2019-02-25SenateReferred to E-12 Finance and Policy
2019-02-25SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1982 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Author added Bernardy

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF1743&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1743&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1743&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1743&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=718
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF1743&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10083
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF1743&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10098
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=1427

Bill Comments

feedback