MN SF1725 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Secretary of State Chapter 168 04/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Forensic laboratories accreditation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forensic laboratories accreditation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-23 - House - House: Passage (Y: 115 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-28 Secretary of State Chapter 168 04/25/14
2014-04-28 Governor's action Approval 04/25/14
2014-04-25 Governor approval
2014-04-24SenateReturned from House
2014-04-23 Presented to Governor
2014-04-23HouseBill was passed vote: 115-15
2014-04-23HouseThird reading
2014-04-10HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 23, 2014
2014-04-09HouseSecond reading
2014-04-09HouseBills identical, SF substituted on General Register
2014-04-08HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2156
2014-04-08HouseReceived from Senate
2014-04-07SenateThird reading Passed vote: 64-0
2014-04-07SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading
2014-03-03SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2014-02-27SenateAuthor added Goodwin
2014-02-25SenateReferred to Judiciary
2014-02-25SenateIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback