MN SF1714 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign Finance and Public Disclosure Board provisions technical modifications
Title
Campaign Finance and Public Disclosure Board provisions technical modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Author added Rest |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1803 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Second reading