MN SF1706 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Garnishment of earnings provisions modification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Garnishment of earnings provisions modification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseSecond reading
2019-05-10HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2019-05-09HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2065
2019-05-09HouseReceived from Senate
2019-05-09SenateThird reading Passed
2019-05-09SenateSpecial Order
2019-03-18SenateSecond reading
2019-03-18SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-02-25SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-02-25SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2065 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback