MN SF1704 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Coverage requirement for infertility treatment
Title
Coverage requirement for infertility treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] |
Sen. David Dibble [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Author added Dibble |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1658 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Author added Hassan