MN SF1701 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Service Employees International Union Healthcare Minnesota and state of Minnesota labor agreement ratification
Title
Service Employees International Union Healthcare Minnesota and state of Minnesota labor agreement ratification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1685 (Similar To) 2021-03-23 - Author added Schomacker